OH SB24 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Effective 2/5/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To establish the Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Alzheimer's Disease and Dementias Task Force

Sponsors

Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]

Roll Calls

2019-10-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05 Effective 2/5/20
2019-10-23SenateConcurred in House amendments
2019-10-10HousePassed
2019-05-30HouseReported - Amended: Aging and Long-Term Care
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Aging and Long-Term Care
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateReported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-02-13SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback