OH SB232 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2105.14, 2107.34, 2109.301, 5302.23, and 5302.24 and to enact section 5801.12 of the Revised Code to amend the law related to transfer on death designation deeds and affidavits and to make changes in the probate and trust laws regarding the inheritance and beneficial rights of afterborn or pretermitted children or heirs.
Title
Changes the law governing transfer on death instruments
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-11-29 | House | Passed |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2016-04-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Wills and Estates
Housing and Real Property : Real Estate Transactions
Juvenile and Family Law
Courts and Civil Law : Wills and Estates
Housing and Real Property : Real Estate Transactions
Juvenile and Family Law
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 05 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 07 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 09 | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
53 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 02 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 02 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
58 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
58 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
58 | 01 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |