OH SB22 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Effective 6/23/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 106.022, 111.15, 119.03, 2743.03, 3701.13, 3701.14, 3707.01, 3707.26, 3715.74, and 4935.03 and to enact sections 101.36, 103.65, 103.651, 107.42, 107.43, 3707.11, 3707.54, 3709.212, and 3709.50 of the Revised Code to establish legislative oversight of certain orders and rules issued by the executive branch, including by establishing the Ohio Health Oversight and Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish legislative oversight over Governor's and health orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23 Effective 6/23/21
2021-03-24SenatePassed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
2021-03-24SenateVeto receipt
2021-03-10SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-03-10HousePassed
2021-03-10HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2021-02-24HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2021-02-17SenatePassed
2021-02-17SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10136New CodeSee Bill Text
10365New CodeSee Bill Text
103651New CodeSee Bill Text
106022Amended CodeCitation Text
10742New CodeSee Bill Text
10743New CodeSee Bill Text
11115Amended CodeCitation Text
11903Amended CodeCitation Text
274303Amended CodeCitation Text
370113Amended CodeCitation Text
370114Amended CodeCitation Text
370701Amended CodeCitation Text
370711New CodeSee Bill Text
370726Amended CodeCitation Text
370754New CodeSee Bill Text
3709212New CodeSee Bill Text
370950New CodeSee Bill Text
371574Amended CodeCitation Text
493503Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-22
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/EN/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb22/EN/05/sb22_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15480&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15576&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15671&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15674&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15678&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15703&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15705&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15953&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15952&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15961&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15959&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15960&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16006&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16205&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16260&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-22

Bill Comments

feedback