OH SB2 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 939.02, 940.06, 6119.06, 6119.09, and 6119.091 and to enact sections 940.36 and 940.37 of the Revised Code to create the Statewide Watershed Planning and Management Program under the administration of the Director of Agriculture and to make changes to the law governing regional water and sewer districts.
Title
Create state watershed planning structure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Environment and Natural Resources : Conservancy and Other Districts
Finance and Appropriations
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Environment and Natural Resources : Conservancy and Other Districts
Finance and Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
61 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
61 | 19 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 19 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 19 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 40 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 40 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 40 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |