OH SB2 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Effective 10/6/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1506.21, 1506.23, 3714.01, 3714.02, 3714.051, 3714.06, 3714.062, 3714.082, 3734.061, 3734.19, 3734.20, 3734.21, 3734.22, 3734.23, 3734.30, 5301.80, 6109.02, 6109.08, 6109.24, 6111.03, 6111.04, 6111.07, and 6111.30 and to enact sections 3714.022, 6109.25, 6111.052, 6111.33, and 6111.34 of the Revised Code to revise specified laws relating to environmental protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise environmental protection laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06 Effective 10/6/17
2017-06-21HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseReported: Energy and Natural Resources
2017-03-29HouseRefer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
2017-03-16HouseIntroduced
2017-03-15SenatePassed
2017-03-09SenateReported - Amended: Energy and Natural Resources
2017-02-01SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1506Amended CodeCitation Text
150621Amended CodeCitation Text
150623Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3714Amended CodeCitation Text
371401Amended CodeCitation Text
371402Amended CodeCitation Text
3714022New CodeSee Bill Text
3714051Amended CodeCitation Text
371406Amended CodeCitation Text
3714062Amended CodeCitation Text
3714082Amended CodeCitation Text
3734Amended CodeCitation Text
3734061Amended CodeCitation Text
373419Amended CodeCitation Text
373420Amended CodeCitation Text
373421Amended CodeCitation Text
373422Amended CodeCitation Text
373423Amended CodeCitation Text
373430Amended CodeCitation Text
53Amended CodeCitation Text
5301Amended CodeCitation Text
530180Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6109Amended CodeCitation Text
610902Amended CodeCitation Text
610908Amended CodeCitation Text
610924Amended CodeCitation Text
610925New CodeSee Bill Text
6111Amended CodeCitation Text
611103Amended CodeCitation Text
611104Amended CodeCitation Text
6111052New CodeSee Bill Text
611107Amended CodeCitation Text
611130Amended CodeCitation Text
611133New CodeSee Bill Text
611134New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback