OH SB187 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 3313.5317, 3345.561, 3376.01, 3376.02, 3376.03, 3376.04, 3376.05, 3376.06, 3376.07, and 3376.08 of the Revised Code to allow intercollegiate athletes to earn compensation from their name, image, or likeness, to enact the Save Women's Sports Act to require schools, state institutions of higher education, and private colleges to designate separate single-sex teams and sports for each sex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow intercollegiate athletes to earn compensation for names

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24HousePassed - Amended
2021-06-24HouseReported: State and Local Government
2021-06-22HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2021-06-16SenatePassed
2021-06-16SenateReported - Substitute: Workforce and Higher Education
2021-05-26SenateRefer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
2021-05-25SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33135317New CodeSee Bill Text
3345561New CodeSee Bill Text
337601New CodeSee Bill Text
337602New CodeSee Bill Text
337603New CodeSee Bill Text
337604New CodeSee Bill Text
337605New CodeSee Bill Text
337606New CodeSee Bill Text
337607New CodeSee Bill Text
337608New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-187
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb187/IN/00/sb187_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb187/RS/01/sb187_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb187/PS/02/sb187_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb187/RH/03/sb187_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb187/PH/04/sb187_04_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16884&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16943&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17036&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17046&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17093&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17112&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17176&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17174&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17172&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17211&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17209&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17316&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-187

Bill Comments

feedback