OH SB175 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective 4/6/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective 4/6/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2307.601, 2901.05, 2901.09, and 2923.126 of the Revised Code to grant civil immunity to nonprofit corporations for certain injuries, deaths, or losses resulting from the carrying of handguns and to expand the locations at which a person has no duty to retreat before using force under both civil and criminal law.
Title
Grant civil immunity-injury, death, loss from carrying handguns
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective 4/6/21 | |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-17 | House | Informally passed |
2020-12-08 | House | Informally passed |
2020-12-02 | House | Informally passed |
2020-11-19 | House | Informally passed |
2020-11-18 | House | Reported: Civil Justice |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Judiciary |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 07 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 01 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 01 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |