OH SB170 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-23)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4503.19, 4503.191, and 4503.83 of the Revised Code to require the universal validation sticker available to owners of passenger vehicle fleets to be issued without an expiration date beginning January 1, 2019, and to require the Director of Public Safety to seek approval from the United States Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to implement a temporary pilot program regarding the waiver of the skills test for a commercial driver's license that applies to present and former military personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waive commercial driver test for military and veterans

Sponsors

Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]
Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]
Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-01 Effective 8/1/18
2018-04-11SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-03-21HousePassed
2018-03-15HouseReported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-03-13HouseRe-referred: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-03-13HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2018-03-07HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2018-01-16HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-12-07HouseIntroduced
2017-12-05SenatePassed
2017-12-05SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-09-07SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-06-28SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
450319Amended CodeCitation Text
4503191Amended CodeCitation Text
450383Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-SB-170
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/RH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/PH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb170/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-SB-170

Bill Comments

feedback