OH SB168 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Reported - Substitute: Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Reported - Substitute: Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0714 and 3313.813 of the Revised Code to require the Education Management Information System to include information regarding persons at whom a student's violent behavior that resulted in discipline was directed, to require the Department of Education to submit a one-time report to the General Assembly regarding that information, and to require school districts to allow approved summer food service program sponsors to use school facilities to provide food service for summer intervention services under certain conditions.
Title
Requires reporting concerning victims of student violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | House | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2015-10-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Education |
2015-07-01 | House | Introduced |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reported: Education |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 0714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 813 | Amended Code | Citation Text |