OH SB156 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 2925.15 of the Revised Code to prohibit defrauding an alcohol, drug, or urine screening test.
Title
Prohibits defrauding an alcohol, drug, or urine screening test
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
29 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 25 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |