OH SB15 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To require the State Board of Education to recommend performance standards for dropout programs operated by school districts.
Title
To require the State Board of Education to recommend performance standards for dropout programs operated by school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-06-12 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-01 | To Education | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House | |
2012-06-19 | To Education | |
2012-06-19 | Introduced to Senate |