OH HCR19 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 62-36)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To memorialize the Congress of the United States to oppose any legislation that requires Social Security coverage for members of any of Ohio's state retirement systems.
Title
To memorialize the Congress of the United States to oppose any legislation that requires Social Security coverage for members of any of Ohio's state retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-13 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-06 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2013-06-06 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-05-29 | Committee Report | |
2013-05-07 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-05-07 | Introduced to House |