OH HB82 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-27)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective 9/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3301.0710, 3301.0712, 3301.0714, 3301.0715, 3301.52, 3302.01, 3302.02, 3302.021, 3302.03, 3302.035, 3302.04, 3302.05, 3302.10, 3302.12, 3302.13, 3302.151, 3311.741, 3313.413, 3313.618, 3313.6113, 3313.6114, 3314.012, 3314.02, 3314.03, 3314.034, 3314.05, 3314.35, 3326.11, and 3328.24 and to enact sections 3302.037, 3302.038, and 3302.039 of the Revised Code with regard to nationally standardized college admissions assessment and to revise the state report card and accountability systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate required assessment for high school graduation

Sponsors

Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Susan Manchester [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]
Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Effective 9/30/21
2021-06-25HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-06-24HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2021-06-23SenatePassed
2021-06-23SenateReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-06-16SenateRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-06-10HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33010710Amended CodeCitation Text
33010712Amended CodeCitation Text
33010714Amended CodeCitation Text
33010715Amended CodeCitation Text
330152Amended CodeCitation Text
330201Amended CodeCitation Text
330202Amended CodeCitation Text
3302021Amended CodeCitation Text
330203Amended CodeCitation Text
3302035Amended CodeCitation Text
3302037New CodeSee Bill Text
3302038New CodeSee Bill Text
3302039New CodeSee Bill Text
330204Amended CodeCitation Text
330205Amended CodeCitation Text
330210Amended CodeCitation Text
330212Amended CodeCitation Text
330213Amended CodeCitation Text
3302151Amended CodeCitation Text
3311741Amended CodeCitation Text
3313413Amended CodeCitation Text
33136113Amended CodeCitation Text
33136114Amended CodeCitation Text
3313618Amended CodeCitation Text
3314012Amended CodeCitation Text
331402Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
3314034Amended CodeCitation Text
331405Amended CodeCitation Text
331435Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
332824Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-82
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb82/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb82/RH/01/hb82_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb82/PH/02/hb82_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb82/RS/03/hb82_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb82/PS/04/hb82_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb82/EN/05/hb82_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15660&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16710&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16748&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16798&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16838&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16863&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16963&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17104&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17135&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17149&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17170&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17155&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17159&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17231&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17325&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-82

Bill Comments

feedback