OH HB76 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
Pending: Senate General Government and Agency Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 133.18, 306.32, 306.322, 345.01, 345.03, 345.04, 505.37, 505.48, 505.481, 511.27, 511.28, 511.34, 513.18, 755.181, 1545.041, 1545.21, 1711.30, 3311.50, 3318.01, 3318.06, 3318.061, 3318.062, 3318.063, 3318.361, 3318.45, 3381.03, 3505.06, 4582.024, 4582.26, 5705.01, 5705.03, 5705.192, 5705.195, 5705.196, 5705.197, 5705.199, 5705.21, 5705.212, 5705.213, 5705.215, 5705.218, 5705.219, 5705.233, 5705.25, 5705.251, 5705.261, 5705.55, 5748.01, 5748.02, 5748.03, 5748.04, 5748.08, and 5748.09 of the Revised Code to enact the "Ballot Uniformity and Transparency Act" to modify the form of election notices and ballot language for property tax levies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Ballot Uniformity and Transparency Act for tax levies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateRefer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
2019-10-28SenateIntroduced
2019-10-24HousePassed - Amended
2019-04-10HouseReported - Amended: Ways and Means
2019-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
133Amended CodeCitation Text
13318Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1545Amended CodeCitation Text
1545041Amended CodeCitation Text
154521Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1711Amended CodeCitation Text
171130Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
306Amended CodeCitation Text
30632Amended CodeCitation Text
306322Amended CodeCitation Text
345Amended CodeCitation Text
34501Amended CodeCitation Text
34503Amended CodeCitation Text
34504Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3311Amended CodeCitation Text
331150Amended CodeCitation Text
3318Amended CodeCitation Text
331801Amended CodeCitation Text
331806Amended CodeCitation Text
3318061Amended CodeCitation Text
3318062Amended CodeCitation Text
3318063Amended CodeCitation Text
3318361Amended CodeCitation Text
331845Amended CodeCitation Text
3381Amended CodeCitation Text
338103Amended CodeCitation Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3505Amended CodeCitation Text
350506Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4582Amended CodeCitation Text
4582024Amended CodeCitation Text
458226Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
50537Amended CodeCitation Text
50548Amended CodeCitation Text
505481Amended CodeCitation Text
511Amended CodeCitation Text
51127Amended CodeCitation Text
51128Amended CodeCitation Text
51134Amended CodeCitation Text
513Amended CodeCitation Text
51318Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
570501Amended CodeCitation Text
570503Amended CodeCitation Text
5705192Amended CodeCitation Text
5705195Amended CodeCitation Text
5705196Amended CodeCitation Text
5705197Amended CodeCitation Text
5705199Amended CodeCitation Text
570521Amended CodeCitation Text
5705212Amended CodeCitation Text
5705213Amended CodeCitation Text
5705215Amended CodeCitation Text
5705218Amended CodeCitation Text
5705219Amended CodeCitation Text
5705233Amended CodeCitation Text
570525Amended CodeCitation Text
5705251Amended CodeCitation Text
5705261Amended CodeCitation Text
570555Amended CodeCitation Text
5748Amended CodeCitation Text
574801Amended CodeCitation Text
574802Amended CodeCitation Text
574803Amended CodeCitation Text
574804Amended CodeCitation Text
574808Amended CodeCitation Text
574809Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
755Amended CodeCitation Text
755181Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback