OH HB72 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-18)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-18)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 135.807, 149.412, 149.52, 317.02, 317.04, 317.05, 317.07, 317.08, 317.09, 317.10, 317.111, 317.112, 317.12, 317.13, 317.15, 317.17, 317.18, 317.19, 317.20, 317.22, 317.26, 317.28, 317.29, 317.31, 317.32, 317.35, 317.36, 319.203, 319.302, 323.152, 323.43, 503.13, 703.16, 707.09, 709.06, 709.32, 709.38, 709.39, 723.04, 723.05, 961.02, 961.05, 971.15, 1311.06, 1311.35, 1311.42, 1337.08, 1513.33, 1513.37, 1701.73, 1701.81, 1701.811, 1702.38, 1702.43, 1702.462, 1705.38, 1705.381, 1729.38, 1776.70, 1776.74, 1782.433, 1782.4310, 2113.62, 2505.13, 2937.27, 3929.18, 4123.76, 4123.78, 4141.23, 4503.065, 4961.39, 5301.01, 5301.14, 5301.21, 5301.25, 5301.255, 5301.28, 5301.32, 5301.33, 5301.331, 5301.332, 5301.34, 5301.35, 5301.52, 5301.56, 5302.15, 5302.17, 5302.171, 5302.222, 5309.13, 5309.41, 5309.64, 5310.35, 5310.38, 5705.19, 5709.084, 5715.701, 5719.04, 5721.35, 5733.41, 5741.03, 5747.02, 5747.025, 5747.451, and 5815.15 and to repeal sections 317.201, 711.12, and 5310.37 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 803.80 and 803.90 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly generally to modernize and make other changes regarding how the county recorder's office maintains records, to correct and modify recent amendments to tax-related law, and to lengthen the maximum term of a property tax levy for the purpose of zoological parks operated or supported by a county.
Title
And to amend Sections 803.80 and 803.90 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly generally to modernize and make other changes regarding how the county recorder's office maintains records, to correct and modify recent amendments to tax-related law, and to lengthen the maximum term of a property tax levy for the purpose of zoological parks operated or supported by a county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-30 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Effective Date | |
2013-10-31 | Governor' Action | |
2013-11-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-10-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-10-30 | Concurrence | |
2013-10-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-10-16 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-06-06 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2013-06-06 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-05-15 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-02-20 | To State and Local Government | |
2013-02-20 | Introduced to House |