OH HB61 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on January 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on January 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2316 of the Revised Code to designate November 19th as "James A. Garfield Day."
Title
Designate James A. Garfield Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Effective | |
2023-10-12 | Signed By The Governor | |
2023-10-05 | Sent To The Governor | |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Passed |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Reported: Local Government |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to committee: Local Government |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to committee: State and Local Government |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced |