OH HB606 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-16 - Effective 12/16/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To make temporary changes related to qualified civil immunity for health care and emergency services provided during a government-declared disaster or emergency and for exposure to or transmission or contraction of certain coronaviruses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grant immunity to essential workers who transmit COVID-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-16 Effective 12/16/20
2020-09-02SenateConference report agreed to
2020-09-01HouseConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on H.B. 606
2020-09-01SenateConference managers: Sens. - Huffman, M., Eklund, Thomas
2020-09-01HouseConference managers: Reps. - Carfagna, Seitz, Brown
2020-09-01SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2020-09-01HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2020-08-31HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-06-30SenatePassed
2020-06-30SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2020-06-03SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2020-06-02SenateIntroduced
2020-05-28HousePassed - Amended
2020-05-28HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2020-05-05HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2020-04-10HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
274302Amended CodeCitation Text
274401Amended CodeCitation Text
412368Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-606
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/CR/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb606/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-606

Bill Comments

feedback