OH HB606 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.08, 1905.01, 4511.204, and 4511.205 of the Revised Code to abolish a judgeship of the Youngstown Municipal Court; to increase from more than 100 to more than 200 the population necessary for a municipal corporation to have a mayor's court unless the municipal corporation is located entirely on an island in Lake Erie; and to provide that a conviction or guilty plea of the offense of driving a vehicle while writing, sending, or reading a text-based communication on a handheld electronic wireless communications device and a conviction or guilty plea of a substantially equivalent municipal ordinance for the same conduct are allied offenses of similar import and that an adjudication for the offense of a person who is less than 18 years of age from using, in any manner, an electronic wireless communications device while driving and an adjudication of a substantially equivalent municipal ordinance for the same conduct are allied offenses of similar import.
Title
To abolish a judgeship of the Youngstown Municipal Court; to increase from more than 100 to more than 200 the population necessary for a municipal corporation to have a mayor's court unless the municipal corporation is located entirely on an island in Lake Erie; and to provide that a conviction or guilty plea of the offense of driving a vehicle while writing, sending, or reading a text-based communication on a handheld electronic wireless communications device and a conviction or guilty plea of a substantially equivalent municipal ordinance for the same conduct are allied offenses of similar import and that an adjudication for the offense of a person who is less than 18 years of age from using, in any manner, an electronic wireless communications device while driving and an adjudication of a substantially equivalent municipal ordinance for the same conduct are allied offenses of similar import.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-31 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-12-06 | To Judiciary | |
2012-12-06 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-12-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-12-05 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-11-21 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2012-11-21 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 05 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |