OH HB582 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make appropriations for the biennium ending June 30, 2021, and capital reappropriations for the biennium ending June 30, 2022.
Title
Makes appropriations and capital reappropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2020-03-23 | House | Introduced |