OH HB58 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 65-13)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 65-13)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 122.171, 718.151, 5701.11, 5725.98, 5729.98, 5733.0610, 5733.98, 5747.058, 5747.98, 5751.50, and 5751.98 of the Revised Code to expressly incorporate changes in the Internal Revenue Code since December 15, 2010, into Ohio law, to authorize a refundable job retention tax credit, to temporarily extend the look-back period from two years to three years for determining whether a state "on" indicator exists based on the total unemployment rate for purposes of state extended unemployment benefits, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To expressly incorporate changes in the Internal Revenue Code since December 15, 2010, into Ohio law, to authorize a refundable job retention tax credit, to temporarily extend the look-back period from two years to three years for determining whether a state "on" indicator exists based on the total unemployment rate for purposes of state extended unemployment benefits, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Effective Date | |
2011-03-07 | Governor' Action | |
2011-03-16 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-03-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-02 | Concurrence | |
2011-02-23 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-15 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-01-26 | To Ways & Means | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 22 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 01 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 25 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 29 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 33 | 0610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 33 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 058 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 51 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 18 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |