OH HB55 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 955.11, 959.99, 2152.19, 2903.213, 2903.214, 2919.26, 3113.31, 4732.141, and 4757.33 and to enact section 4731.284 of the Revised Code to revise the penalties and sentencing provisions regarding violations of the cruelty to animals statutes, to include the protection of companion animals in temporary protection orders, domestic violence protection orders, anti-stalking protection orders, and related protection orders, and to remove pit bulls from the definition of "vicious dog" in state law.
Title
To revise the penalties and sentencing provisions regarding violations of the cruelty to animals statutes, to include the protection of companion animals in temporary protection orders, domestic violence protection orders, anti-stalking protection orders, and related protection orders, and to remove pit bulls from the definition of "vicious dog" in state law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2010-05-28 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-05-12 | Committee Report - A | |
2009-03-03 | To Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-03 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 52 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 03 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
31 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
31 | 13 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 284 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 32 | 141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 57 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 55 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 59 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_55 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_55_PH_Y.html |