OH HB543 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend section 3319.073 of the Revised Code to enact the "Jason Flatt Act" to require public schools to train staff in youth suicide awareness and prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enact the "Jason Flatt Act" to require public schools to train staff in youth suicide awareness and prevention.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kevin Boyce [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]
Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]
Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]
Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Rep. Mike Foley [D]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]
Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]
Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Rep. Mark Okey [D]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]
Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]
Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-12 Concurrence
2012-12-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-05 Committee Report
2012-05-29 To Education
2012-05-29 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-24 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-23 Committee Report
2012-05-09 To Health & Aging
2012-05-09 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3319Amended CodeCitation Text
3319073Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback