OH HB533 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 5501.44, 5501.70, 5501.71, 5501.73, 5501.78, 5531.11, 5531.12, 5531.13, 5531.14, 5531.15, 5531.16, and 5739.02 and to enact sections 5531.141, 5531.142, 5531.143, 5531.144, 5531.145, 5531.146, 5531.147, 5531.148, and 5531.149 of the Revised Code to provide that a toll project may include the replacement, improvement, rehabilitation, operation, and maintenance of a bridge or system of bridges at one location that carries two interstate highways over the Ohio River to another state, to amend the law governing public-private agreements relative to transportation facilities, and to provide for the collection of user fees on toll projects by toll project operators.
Title
To provide that a toll project may include the replacement, improvement, rehabilitation, operation, and maintenance of a bridge or system of bridges at one location that carries two interstate highways over the Ohio River to another state, to amend the law governing public-private agreements relative to transportation facilities, and to provide for the collection of user fees on toll projects by toll project operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-11 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-06-04 | Committee Report | |
2014-05-22 | To Transportation | |
2014-05-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-06 | To Finance and Appropriations | |
2014-05-06 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
55 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 01 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 01 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 01 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 01 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 01 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 31 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 31 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 31 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 31 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 31 | 141 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 146 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 147 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 148 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 149 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 31 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 31 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |