OH HB528 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3901.62 and 3901.64 of the Revised Code to amend the law related to insurers receiving credit for reinsurance.
Title
Amends law relating to insurers being credited for reinsurance
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff LaRe [R] | Rep. Randi Clites [D] | Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R] | Rep. Joseph Miller [D] |
Rep. Thomas Patton [R] | Rep. William Seitz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported: Insurance |
2020-03-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2020-03-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |