OH HB512 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Effective 9/9/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Effective 9/9/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 6109.01, 6109.10, 6109.22, 6111.036, and 6121.04, and to enact section 6109.121 of the Revised Code to establish requirements governing lead and copper testing for community and nontransient noncommunity water systems, to revise the law governing lead contamination from plumbing fixtures, and to revise the laws governing the Water Pollution Control Loan Fund, the Drinking Water Assistance Fund, and the Ohio Water Development Authority.
Title
Addresses copper and lead water contamination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Effective 9/9/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Informally passed |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported - Substitute: Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-04-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-04-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
61 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
61 | 09 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 09 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 09 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 09 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
61 | 11 | 036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
61 | 21 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |