OH HB501 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 148.061, 303.213, 307.204, 503.01, 505.10, 505.266, 507.02, 507.021, 519.213, 713.081, 4113.52, 5709.41, 5709.74, 5709.75, 5709.78, and 5709.85 and to enact section 505.882 of the Revised Code to make various township law changes, to subject small solar facilities to local regulation, and to make an exception to the Uniform Depository Act for the treasurer and governing board that is a member of the Little Miami Joint Fire and Rescue District for certain investments of interim funds.
Title
Authorize property taxes for school resource officer services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government and Elections |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-12-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-12-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 48 | 061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 03 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 07 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 13 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 03 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 05 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 05 | 266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 05 | 882 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 07 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 07 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 19 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 13 | 081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |