OH HB501 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4511.216, 4513.11, and 5733.98; to enact new section 4513.111 and sections 4513.112, 4513.113, 4513.114, and 4513.115; and to repeal sections 4513.111 and 5733.44 of the Revised Code to clarify the law governing slow-moving vehicles and to revise the lighting and reflective material requirements applicable to animal-drawn vehicles.
Title
Clarify slow-moving vehicle law/animal-drawn vehicle lighting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-08 | House | Passed |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-02-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 11 | 216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 111 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
57 | 33 | 44 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
57 | 33 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |