OH HB5 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 117.091, 2329.66, 2901.02, 2929.18, 2929.24, 2929.25, 2929.27, 2929.28, 2951.02, 4507.02, 4507.164, 4507.35, 4510.036, 4510.037, 4510.11, 4510.12, 4510.14, 4510.16, 4510.161, 4510.21, 4510.22, 4510.41, 4511.19, 4511.203, 4549.02, 4549.021, and 4549.03 and to enact sections 2746.01, 2746.02, 2746.03, 2746.04, 2746.05, 2746.06, 2746.07, 2746.08, 2746.09, and 4510.111 of the Revised Code to require the Ohio Judicial Conference periodically to adjust the dollar amounts specified in the general exemption statute, to provide consolidated references to Revised Code sections that establish costs and fees, other than attorney fees, in the courts of record of this state, to remove the provision specifying that an investigator appointed by the Auditor of State does not have the power and authority to carry a concealed weapon, to modify the penalties for certain offenses relating to the operation of motor vehicles, and to allow for a certificate of judgment to collect a financial reimbursement sanction in certain cases, the modification of a community control sanction, the substitution of a community control sanction for non-mandatory jail days, and the modification of a community service sentence by substituting a contribution to the local entity that funds the court.
Title
To require the Ohio Judicial Conference periodically to adjust the dollar amounts specified in the general exemption statute, to provide consolidated references to Revised Code sections that establish costs and fees, other than attorney fees, in the courts of record of this state, to remove the provision specifying that an investigator appointed by the Auditor of State does not have the power and authority to carry a concealed weapon, to modify the penalties for certain offenses relating to the operation of motor vehicles, and to allow for a certificate of judgment to collect a financial reimbursement sanction in certain cases, the modification of a community control sanction, the substitution of a community control sanction for non-mandatory jail days, and the modification of a community service sentence by substituting a contribution to the local entity that funds the court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-21 | Governor' Action | |
2011-06-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-06-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-06-08 | Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-05-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-30 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Report | |
2011-01-11 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 17 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 29 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
27 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 46 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 51 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 07 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 07 | 164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 07 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 10 | 036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 037 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 10 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 49 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 49 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 49 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |