OH HB48 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3.02, 133.06, 133.18, 302.03, 302.09, 303.11, 303.12, 303.25, 305.02, 305.31, 306.32, 306.321, 306.70, 306.71, 307.676, 307.677, 307.695, 307.697, 307.791, 307.94, 307.95, 322.02, 322.021, 324.02, 324.021, 345.03, 351.26, 503.02, 503.161, 503.24, 503.41, 504.01, 504.03, 505.13, 505.14, 511.01, 511.22, 511.27, 511.28, 511.33, 511.34, 513.06, 513.13, 513.18, 517.05, 519.11, 519.12, 519.25, 705.01, 707.21, 709.29, 709.39, 709.45, 709.462, 709.48, 709.50, 715.69, 715.691, 715.70, 715.71, 715.77, 718.01, 718.09, 718.10, 731.03, 731.28, 731.29, 733.09, 733.261, 733.262, 733.31, 733.48, 749.021, 755.01, 757.02, 759.25, 1515.28, 1545.21, 1545.36, 1711.30, 1901.07, 1901.10, 1901.31, 1907.13, 2101.43, 2301.02, 3311.053, 3311.059, 3311.21, 3311.213, 3311.22, 3311.231, 3311.25, 3311.26, 3311.37, 3311.38, 3311.50, 3311.73, 3316.08, 3318.06, 3318.061, 3318.361, 3354.12, 3355.02, 3355.09, 3357.02, 3357.11, 3375.19, 3375.201, 3375.211, 3375.212, 3501.02, 3501.05, 3501.11, 3501.39, 3503.19, 3505.01, 3505.10, 3505.32, 3506.02, 3509.01, 3509.03, 3509.04, 3509.05, 3511.01, 3511.02, 3511.03, 3511.04, 3511.05, 3511.06, 3511.08, 3511.09, 3511.10, 3511.11, 3511.12, 3511.13, 3513.01, 3513.02, 3513.041, 3513.05, 3513.052, 3513.121, 3513.122, 3513.151, 3513.251, 3513.253, 3513.254, 3513.255, 3513.256, 3513.257, 3513.259, 3513.263, 3513.30, 3513.31, 3513.311, 3513.312, 3519.08, 3519.16, 3709.051, 3709.071, 3709.29, 3767.05, 3769.27, 4117.10, 4301.33, 4301.331, 4301.332, 4301.333, 4301.334, 4301.356, 4301.421, 4301.424, 4303.29, 4305.14, 4504.021, 4504.15, 4504.16, 4504.21, 4928.20, 4929.26, 4931.51, 4931.52, 4931.53, 4951.44, 4955.05, 5705.19, 5705.191, 5705.195, 5705.199, 5705.20, 5705.21, 5705.211, 5705.212, 5705.213, 5705.217, 5705.218, 5705.219, 5705.2111, 5705.22, 5705.221, 5705.222, 5705.23, 5705.24, 5705.25, 5705.251, 5705.261, 5705.27, 5705.71, 5739.021, 5739.022, 5739.026, 5743.021, 5743.024, 5743.026, 5747.01, 5748.02, 5748.04, 5748.08, 6105.18, 6105.20, 6119.31, and 6119.32, and to enact sections 3501.012, 3503.191, 3511.021, 3511.14, 5906.01, 5906.02, 5906.03, and 5906.99, and to repeal section 3509.022 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 409.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly to provide up to two weeks of leave for any employee who is the spouse, parent, or a person who has or had legal custody of a member of the uniformed services who is called to active duty or is injured, wounded, or hospitalized while serving on active duty, to revise the election calendar, to revise the law governing absent voter's ballots for uniformed services and overseas voters to comply with federal law, and to make Persian Gulf, Afghanistan, and Iraq Conflicts veterans' bonuses tax deductible and to make an appropriation.
Title
And to amend Section 409.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly to provide up to two weeks of leave for any employee who is the spouse, parent, or a person who has or had legal custody of a member of the uniformed services who is called to active duty or is injured, wounded, or hospitalized while serving on active duty, to revise the election calendar, to revise the law governing absent voter's ballots for uniformed services and overseas voters to comply with federal law, and to make Persian Gulf, Afghanistan, and Iraq Conflicts veterans' bonuses tax deductible and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-02 | Governor' Action | |
2010-04-09 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-03-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-24 | Concurrence | |
2010-03-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-06-18 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2009-06-18 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-06-17 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-06-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-02-24 | To Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced to House |