OH HB474 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-19)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4501.21 and 4503.499 and to enact sections 4503.576 and 5533.242 of the Revised Code to create the "Ohio State Beekeepers Association" license plate, to alter the law governing the pediatric brain tumor awareness license plate, and to designate a portion of Interstate Route 75 in Hamilton County as the "William L. Mallory, Sr. Memorial Highway."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create the "Ohio State Beekeepers Association" license plate, to alter the law governing the pediatric brain tumor awareness license plate, and to designate a portion of Interstate Route 75 in Hamilton County as the "William L. Mallory, Sr. Memorial Highway."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-19 Governor' Action
2014-12-17 Concurrence
2014-12-11 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2014-12-10 Committee Report
2014-06-09 To Transportation
2014-06-09 Introduced to Senate
2014-06-04 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-05-13 Committee Report
2014-03-12 To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security
2014-03-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450121Amended CodeCitation Text
4503New CodeSee Bill Text
4503499Amended CodeCitation Text
4503576New CodeSee Bill Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5533New CodeSee Bill Text
5533242New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback