OH HB458 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 107.07, 111.16, 111.31, 323.17, 3501.01, 3501.05, 3501.11, 3501.22, 3501.29, 3503.14, 3503.15, 3503.16, 3503.19, 3503.28, 3505.18, 3505.181, 3505.182, 3505.183, 3505.34, 3505.38, 3506.14, 3509.01, 3509.03, 3509.04, 3509.05, 3509.051, 3509.06, 3509.07, 3509.08, 3509.09, 3509.10, 3511.02, 3511.04, 3511.05, 3511.06, 3511.07, 3511.08, 3511.09, 3511.10, 3511.11, 3511.13, 3599.21, 4506.11, 4507.13, 4507.50, 4507.51, and 4507.52; to enact sections 3501.022, 3505.19, 3506.24, 4507.233, and 4507.49; and to repeal section 107.06 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing voter identification and absent voting and other aspects of the Election Law and to make changes regarding driver's licenses and state identification cards.
Title
Eliminate August special elections except for US House nomination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government and Elections |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-09 | House | Passed |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-10-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-10-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Elections
Public Safety
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Public Safety
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Motor Vehicles