OH HB437 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 3327.15 of the Revised Code to increase the number of miles a school district board may authorize its motor vehicles for out-of-state travel.
Title
To increase the number of miles a school district board may authorize its motor vehicles for out-of-state travel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Effective Date | |
2012-06-26 | Governor' Action | |
2012-07-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-06-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Committee Report | |
2012-04-25 | To Education | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-04-19 | Committee Report | |
2012-01-31 | To Education | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 27 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |