OH HB417 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 4731.228 of the Revised Code regarding responsibility for notifying patients that a physician's employment by a health care entity has been terminated.
Title
Regarding responsibility for notifying patients that a physician's employment by a health care entity has been terminated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-11 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-05 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-10 | To *Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2012-05-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-04-24 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-01-17 | To Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 228 | New Code | See Bill Text |