OH HB393 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 311.06, 313.07, 317.321, 505.87, and 1711.15 and to enact sections 5.033 and 5.034 of the Revised Code, to amend Section 701.05 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly, and to amend Section 701.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to revise the notice required to be provided by a board of township trustees to a landowner and any lienholder for a subsequent nuisance determination made within 12 months after a nuisance determination was made regarding the same property, to authorize maintenance of a sheriff's or coroner's office outside the county seat of justice, to increase the maximum portion of recording fees that may be earmarked for county recorders' equipment funds, to authorize a board of county commissioners that provides financial assistance to a county agricultural society to provide such assistance from the county's permanent improvement fund, to authorize a single-county solid waste management district to make a loan to a port authority in the same county for use by the authority to assist facilities that provide general health services in that county, to adopt the spotted salamander as the state amphibian and the bullfrog as the state frog, to change the report deadline of the Ohio Legislative Commission on the Education and Preservation of State History from July 1, 2010, to September 1, 2010, and to declare an emergency.
Title
, to amend Section 701.05 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly, and to amend Section 701.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to revise the notice required to be provided by a board of township trustees to a landowner and any lienholder for a subsequent nuisance determination made within 12 months after a nuisance determination was made regarding the same property, to authorize maintenance of a sheriff's or coroner's office outside the county seat of justice, to increase the maximum portion of recording fees that may be earmarked for county recorders' equipment funds, to authorize a board of county commissioners that provides financial assistance to a county agricultural society to provide such assistance from the county's permanent improvement fund, to authorize a single-county solid waste management district to make a loan to a port authority in the same county for use by the authority to assist facilities that provide general health services in that county, to adopt the spotted salamander as the state amphibian and the bullfrog as the state frog, to change the report deadline of the Ohio Legislative Commission on the Education and Preservation of State History from July 1, 2010, to September 1, 2010, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-18 | Governor' Action | |
2010-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-06-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-06-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-05-20 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-05-20 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-03-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-12-10 | To Local Government/Public Administration | |
2009-12-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 11 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 11 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 13 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 17 | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
5 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
5 | 05 | 87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |