OH HB392 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 909.19 of the Revised Code to grant specified apiary owners immunity in personal injury or property damage cases involving bee stings.
Title
Grant apiary owners immunity from certain torts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Economic Development, Commerce, and Labor |
2017-10-31 | House | Refer to Committee: Economic Development, Commerce, and Labor |
2017-10-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
9 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 09 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |