OH HB390 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-11-12 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-11-12 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2329.01, 2329.44, and 5721.20 of the Revised Code to revise the law relating to the notice of excess funds in real property foreclosure sales.
Title
Regards notice of excess funds in property foreclosure sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-12 | Senate | Referred to committee: General Government |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported: Civil Justice |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to committee: Civil Justice |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 29 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 21 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |