OH HB380 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2743.02, 2744.02, 4123.01, 4123.51, and 4123.59 and to enact sections 2307.82 and 4123.513 of the Revised Code to prohibit illegal and unauthorized aliens from receiving compensation and certain benefits under Ohio's Workers' Compensation Law.
Title
Prohibit unauthorized aliens from receiving Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2017-10-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2017-10-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
23 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 07 | 82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
27 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
27 | 43 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
27 | 44 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 23 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 513 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |