OH HB360 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2903.31, 3301.22, 3313.66, 3313.661, 3313.666, 3314.03, and 3326.11 and to enact sections 3313.669, 3319.318, and 3345.19 of the Revised Code to enact the "Ohio Anti-Bullying and Hazing Act" with regard to school discipline and bullying and hazing policies at public schools and colleges.
Title
Enact Ohio Anti-Bullying and Hazing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-09-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 669 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 19 | 318 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 45 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |