OH HB358 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 5.2316, 5.2521, 5.2522, 5.2525, and 5.293 of the Revised Code to make multiple special designations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Eugene 'Gene' F. Kranz Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-05-26SenateIntroduced
2020-05-20HousePassed - Amended
2019-12-12HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-10-09HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-10-08HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback