OH HB352 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - Effective 8/31/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - Effective 8/31/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.256 of the Revised Code to designate April as "Osteopathic Medicine Recognition Month."
Title
Designates a recognition month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Effective 8/31/16 | |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported: Health and Human Services |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | House | Passed |
2015-10-19 | House | Reported: Health and Aging |
2015-10-07 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2015-10-01 | House | Introduced |