OH HB352 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 6109.24, 6109.31, and 6109.32 and to enact section 6109.99 of the Revised Code to require certain public water systems to submit technical, managerial, and financial capability plans under certain noncompliance or public health risk conditions, to implement capability assurance plans, and to add prohibitions and penalties to the Safe Drinking Water Law.
Title
To require certain public water systems to submit technical, managerial, and financial capability plans under certain noncompliance or public health risk conditions, to implement capability assurance plans, and to add prohibitions and penalties to the Safe Drinking Water Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-06-08 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-05-26 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-11-04 | To Local Government/Public Administration | |
2009-11-04 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
61 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
61 | 09 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 09 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 09 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 09 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_352 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_352_PH_Y.html |