OH HB34 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Re-referred: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Re-referred: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3314.03, 3326.11, and 3328.24 and to enact section 3319.324 of the Revised Code to require that public and private schools transmit a transferred student's records within five school days.
Title
Require schools transmit certain student's records within 5 days
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2022-02-01 | House | Informally passed |
2022-01-24 | House | Informally passed |
2022-01-18 | House | Informally passed |
2021-12-14 | House | Informally passed |
2021-12-07 | House | Informally passed |
2021-11-23 | House | Informally passed |
2021-11-16 | House | Informally passed |
2021-11-08 | House | Informally passed |
2021-10-26 | House | Informally passed |
2021-10-12 | House | Informally passed |
2021-09-29 | House | Informally passed |
2021-09-22 | House | Informally passed |
2021-06-28 | House | Informally passed |
2021-06-25 | House | Informally passed |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-02-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 324 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 28 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |