OH HB34 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-17)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Effective 11/2/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.312, 109.43, 124.327, 128.07, 149.30, 149.43, 303.14, 307.204, 309.09, 340.02, 343.01, 505.266, 519.14, 713.21, 902.04, 929.02, 931.03, 940.20, 3517.01, 3517.11, 4301.39, 5713.082, 5713.31, 5713.32, 5715.19, 5715.20, 5717.01, 5721.30, 5721.31, 5721.32, 5721.33, and 5727.75 and to enact sections 308.061, 4582.021, and 4582.23 of the Revised Code to authorize certain state agencies, local governments, and other boards, commissions, and officers to deliver certain notices by ordinary mail and electronically instead of by certified mail, to modify the requirements for public records training for elected officials, and to allow a county prosecuting attorney to enter into a contract with a regional airport authority, port authority, or regional planning commission to be its legal adviser.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deliver notices by ordinary mail or electronically

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-02 Effective 11/2/18
2018-07-24HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-07-10SenatePassed
2018-06-27SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-03-07SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-03-02SenateIntroduced
2017-02-28HousePassed
2017-02-22HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2017-02-08HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10943Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
124327Amended CodeCitation Text
128Amended CodeCitation Text
12807Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14930Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
303Amended CodeCitation Text
30314Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
307204Amended CodeCitation Text
307699Amended CodeCitation Text
308New CodeSee Bill Text
308061New CodeSee Bill Text
309Amended CodeCitation Text
30909Amended CodeCitation Text
340Amended CodeCitation Text
34002Amended CodeCitation Text
343Amended CodeCitation Text
34301Amended CodeCitation Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3517Amended CodeCitation Text
351701Amended CodeCitation Text
351711Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3791Amended CodeCitation Text
379112Amended CodeCitation Text
43Amended CodeCitation Text
4301Amended CodeCitation Text
430139Amended CodeCitation Text
45New CodeSee Bill Text
4582New CodeSee Bill Text
4582021New CodeSee Bill Text
458223New CodeSee Bill Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
505109Amended CodeCitation Text
505266Amended CodeCitation Text
505391Amended CodeCitation Text
505511Amended CodeCitation Text
519Amended CodeCitation Text
51914Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
5713082Amended CodeCitation Text
571331Amended CodeCitation Text
571332Amended CodeCitation Text
5715Amended CodeCitation Text
571512Amended CodeCitation Text
571519Amended CodeCitation Text
571520Amended CodeCitation Text
5717Amended CodeCitation Text
571701Amended CodeCitation Text
5721Amended CodeCitation Text
572130Amended CodeCitation Text
572131Amended CodeCitation Text
572132Amended CodeCitation Text
572133Amended CodeCitation Text
5727Amended CodeCitation Text
572775Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
713Amended CodeCitation Text
71321Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
902Amended CodeCitation Text
90204Amended CodeCitation Text
929Amended CodeCitation Text
92902Amended CodeCitation Text
931Amended CodeCitation Text
93103Amended CodeCitation Text
940Amended CodeCitation Text
94020Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback