OH HB314 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5741.02 of the Revised Code to exempt from state and local use taxes certain watercraft seasonally stored or repaired in Ohio.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt watercraft seasonally stored, repaired from certain taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23SenateIntroduced
2021-11-17HousePassed
2021-06-09HouseReported: Ways and Means
2021-05-19HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-05-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
574102Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-314
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb314/IN/00/hb314_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb314/RH/01/hb314_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb314/PH/02/hb314_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16812&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16931&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16970&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16979&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17889&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-314

Bill Comments

feedback