OH HB3 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-7)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 117.432, 117.58, 149.60, 149.61, and 3375.03 of the Revised Code to create the DataOhio Board, to specify requirements for posting public records online, to require the Auditor of State to adopt rules regarding a uniform accounting system for public offices, to establish an online catalog of public data at data.Ohio.gov, to establish the Local Government Information Exchange Grant Program, and to make appropriations.
Title
Improve transparency of public data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed |
2017-12-13 | House | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Public Records
State and Local Government : State Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Public Records
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 17 | 432 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 17 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 49 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 49 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 75 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |