OH HB270 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.251 of the Revised Code to designate October 16 as "Dravet Syndrome Awareness Day."
Title
To designate October 16 as "Dravet Syndrome Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-02-13 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-02-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-02-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report | |
2013-09-19 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-09-19 | Introduced to House |