OH HB265 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-32)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective 6/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1923.02, 2950.034, 5103.13, 5103.131, 5321.03, and 5321.051; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 5103.132 (5103.6016); and to enact sections 5103.60, 5103.602, 5103.603, 5103.608, 5103.609, 5103.6010, 5103.6011, 5103.6012, 5103.6015, 5103.6017, 5103.6018, 5103.61, 5103.611, 5103.612, 5103.614, 5103.615, and 5103.617 of the Revised Code regarding children's crisis care facilities and residential infant care centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards children's crisis care facilities and infant care centers

Sponsors

Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Susan Manchester [R]
Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-02 Effective 6/13/22
2022-03-02HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2022-02-16SenatePassed
2022-02-09SenateReported - Substitute: Health
2021-10-06SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-09-30SenateIntroduced
2021-09-29HousePassed
2021-06-25HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-04-22HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-04-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192302Amended CodeCitation Text
2950034Amended CodeCitation Text
510313Amended CodeCitation Text
5103131Amended CodeCitation Text
5103132Amended CodeCitation Text
510360New CodeSee Bill Text
51036010New CodeSee Bill Text
51036011New CodeSee Bill Text
51036012New CodeSee Bill Text
51036015New CodeSee Bill Text
51036017New CodeSee Bill Text
51036018New CodeSee Bill Text
5103602New CodeSee Bill Text
5103603New CodeSee Bill Text
5103608New CodeSee Bill Text
5103609New CodeSee Bill Text
510361New CodeSee Bill Text
5103611New CodeSee Bill Text
5103612New CodeSee Bill Text
5103614New CodeSee Bill Text
5103615New CodeSee Bill Text
5103617New CodeSee Bill Text
532103Amended CodeCitation Text
5321051Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-265
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb265/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb265/RH/01/hb265_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb265/PH/02/hb265_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb265/RS/03/hb265_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb265/PS/04/hb265_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb265/EN/05/hb265_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16459&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16947&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17239&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17242&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17495&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17502&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17928&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18321&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18325&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18317&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18404&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18541&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18665&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-265

Bill Comments

feedback