OH HB248 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Re-referred: Health and Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Re-referred: Health and Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1739.05 and 5167.12 and to enact sections 1751.691, 3923.851, and 5164.091 of the Revised Code regarding health insurance, Medicaid, and opioid analgesic drug products.
Title
Addresses opioid analgesic drugs with abuse deterrent technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Re-referred: Health and Aging |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health and Aging |
2015-06-11 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2015-06-08 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 39 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 51 | 691 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 23 | 851 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 64 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 67 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 67 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |