OH HB244 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-19)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-02 - To Judiciary Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-02 - To Judiciary Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3105.171, 3105.63, and 3105.65 of the Revised Code to permit a court to modify a division of property in a divorce decree or decree of dissolution of marriage upon the express written consent or agreement of both spouses.
Title
To permit a court to modify a division of property in a divorce decree or decree of dissolution of marriage upon the express written consent or agreement of both spouses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-02 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2009-12-02 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-12-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-10-28 | Committee Report - A | |
2009-06-29 | To Judiciary | |
2009-06-29 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
31 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
31 | 05 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 05 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 05 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_244 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_244_PH_Y.html |