OH HB236 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Manually Generate Message Element
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Manually Generate Message Element
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4733.151 of the Revised Code to require professional engineers to complete continuing professional development hours in professional ethics or rules relevant to engineering or surveying practices.
Title
Revises continuing education for engineers and surveyors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | Senate | Manually Generate Message Element |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Passed |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Informally passed |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-26 | House | Passed |
2015-12-03 | House | Reported: Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 33 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |